|
06/29/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 346.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
By a vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57TH calendar day by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|