|
06/28/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 251.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 2, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|