|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 52. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/31/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported with amendments (11-9) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House committee amendments rejected.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|