05/02/2011 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 7, nays 90. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
04/27/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2011. | |||
04/27/2011 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
04/26/2011 | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
04/08/2011 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011. | |||
04/08/2011 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
04/08/2011 | Prefiled. |