|
06/20/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported with amendments (21-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/11/2011.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|