Louisiana 2011 2011 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB15 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 11RS-113	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2011
HOUSE BILL NO. 15
BY REPRESENTATIVE RICHARD
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
PUBLIC CONTRACTS:  Provides for a 10% reduction of all state professional, personal,
consulting, and social service contracts
AN ACT1
To enact Subpart G of Part I of Chapter 16 of Subtitle III of Title 39 of the Louisiana2
Revised Statutes of 1950, to be comprised of R.S. 39:1493.11, relative to3
professional, personal, and consulting services procurement; to require a reduction4
in the dollar amount of certain professional, personal, consulting, and social service5
contracts; to provide for the submission of periodic reports; to provide for6
exceptions; to provide for an effective date; and to provide for related matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1. Subpart G of Part I of Chapter 16 of Subtitle III of Title 39 of the9
Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950, comprised of R.S. 39:1493.11, is hereby enacted to read10
as follows: 11
SUBPART G.  REDUCTION OF CONTRACTS FOR FISCAL YEAR 2011-201212
ยง1493.11.  Reduction of contracts for Fiscal Year 2011-201213
A.(1) The total dollar amount for professional, personal, consulting, and14
social services contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual review for15
Fiscal Year 2011-2012 shall be reduced by no less than ten percent of the total dollar16
amount for such contracts for Fiscal Year 2010-2011.17
(2) The office of contractual review shall submit reports on the status of the18
implementation of this Section to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget on19
October 1, 2011, January 1, 2012, April 1, 2012, and July 1, 2012.20 HLS 11RS-113	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 15
Page 2 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
B. The office of contractual review shall not approve any contract if such1
approval would increase the total dollar amount of contracts as required in2
Subsection A of this Section unless such contract meets all of the following criteria:3
(1) Either no employee of the contracting department or agency is both4
competent and available to perform the services called for by the proposed contract5
or the services called for are not the type readily susceptible to being performed by6
persons who are employed by the state on a continuing basis.7
(2) The services are not available as a product of a prior or existing contract.8
(3) The contracting department or agency has submitted to the office of9
contractual review a written plan to monitor and evaluate the performance called for10
in the proposed contract.11
(4) It is more cost effective to obtain the proposed services through the12
contract than to have the services provided by the contracting department or agency13
if the department or agency can provide the services or by agreement with another14
state department or agency.15
(5) The commissioner of administration determines that the proposed contract16
represents a priority expenditure for Louisiana state government.17
Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2011; if vetoed by the governor18
and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,19
2011, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.20
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Richard	HB No. 15
Abstract: Requires a 10% reduction in the total dollar amount for professional, personal,
consulting, and social services contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of
contractual review for FY 2011-2012.
Proposed law requires a 10% reduction in the total dollar amount for professional, personal,
consulting, and social services contracts under the jurisdiction of the office of contractual
review for FY 2011-2012. HLS 11RS-113	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 15
Page 3 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Proposed law requires the office of contractual review to submit reports on the status of the
implementation of proposed law to the Joint Legislative Committee on the Budget on Oct.
1, 2011, Jan. 1, 2012, April 1, 2012, and July 1, 2012. 
Proposed law prohibits the office of contractual review from approving any contract if such
approval would increase the total dollar amount of contracts above the reduction required
in proposed law unless such contract meets all of the following criteria:
(1)Either no employee of the contracting department or agency is both competent and
available to perform the services called for by the proposed contract or the services
called for are not the type readily susceptible to being performed by persons who are
employed by the state on a continuing basis.
(2)The services are not available as a product of a prior or existing contract.
(3)The contracting department or agency has submitted to the office of contractual
review a written plan to monitor and evaluate the performance called for in the
proposed contract.
(4)It is more cost effective to obtain the proposed services through the contract than to
have the services provided by the contracting department or agency if the department
or agency can provide the services or by agreement with another state department or
agency.
(5)The commissioner of administration determines that the proposed contract represents
a priority expenditure for La. state government.
Effective July 1, 2011.
(Adds R.S. 39:1493.11)