|
06/02/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|