|
06/30/2011
|
Effective date: June 30, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 22.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/23/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/22/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 06/20.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read by title.
|
|
|