|
06/20/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 85.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 35. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported with amendments (13-0-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|