|
06/28/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 264.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/23/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Chabert, LaFleur, and Marionneaux.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Lambert, Dove, and Leger.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|