|
06/28/2011
|
Effective date: July 1, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 265.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 12. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/3/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|