|
06/30/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 376.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported with amendments (17-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|