|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|