|
07/13/2011
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Becomes Act No. 422.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
By a vote of 86 yeas, 3 nays the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 5. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Reported without amendments (10-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Reported with amendments (21-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|