06/06/2011 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |||
05/27/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2011. | |||
05/26/2011 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |||
05/25/2011 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |||
04/18/2011 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |||
04/14/2011 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |||
04/14/2011 | Prefiled. |