05/16/2011 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |||
04/26/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
04/26/2011 | Called from the calendar. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title. | |||
04/18/2011 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |||
04/15/2011 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
04/15/2011 | Prefiled. |