06/08/2011 | Withdrawn from the files of the House. | |||
06/08/2011 | Read by title. House floor amendments adopted. | |||
06/08/2011 | Called from the calendar. | |||
06/02/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011. | |||
06/02/2011 | Notice given. | |||
05/18/2011 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/12/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2011. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/18/2011 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |||
04/15/2011 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/15/2011 | Prefiled. |