|
06/28/2011
|
Effective date: June 28, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 287.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/22/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Smith, John, Morrell, and Chabert.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Dove, and Moreno.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported with amendments (11-0-1) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|