LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB490
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB490
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB490
Action History
04/27/2011
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
04/27/2011
Called from the calendar.
04/25/2011
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
04/25/2011
Read by title.
04/18/2011
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
04/15/2011
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
04/15/2011
Prefiled.