|
06/28/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 291.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/22/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|