|
05/31/2011
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/24/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 05/23.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/28/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|