LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB566
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB566
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB566
Action History
05/04/2011
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
05/03/2011
Read by title.
04/18/2011
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
04/15/2011
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.