06/07/2011 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 41, nays 51. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
06/02/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2011. | |||
06/02/2011 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |||
06/01/2011 | Reported with amendments (11-4) (Regular). | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/18/2011 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |||
04/15/2011 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/15/2011 | Prefiled. |