|
06/19/2011
|
Notice House sustained the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Veto message read, by a vote of 58 yeas and 44 nays, veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 30. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/24/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably (10-5) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Read by title.
|
|
|