|
06/29/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 370.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/16/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/15/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 168 reported by the Committee on Insurance (9-0).
|
|
|