|
06/24/2011
|
Effective date: August 15, 2011.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 208.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 558 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (13-0).
|
|
|