05/11/2011 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 61. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/11/2011 | Called from the calendar. | |||
05/09/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2011. | |||
05/09/2011 | Notice given. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/04/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/9/2011. | |||
05/03/2011 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |||
05/02/2011 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). | |||
04/25/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
04/08/2011 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/8/2011. | |||
04/05/2011 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |||
04/05/2011 | Prefiled. |