LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB9
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB9
Action History
05/04/2011
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
04/25/2011
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
03/04/2011
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2011.
03/02/2011
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
03/02/2011
Prefiled.