LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR128
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR128
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR128
Action History
06/14/2011
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
06/14/2011
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
06/09/2011
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011.
06/09/2011
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
06/08/2011
Reported with amendments (17-0).
05/26/2011
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
05/25/2011
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.