|
06/27/2011
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Donahue, and Appel.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Carmody, Patricia Smith, and Schroder.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read by title. Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/22/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|