LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR3
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR3
Action History
06/14/2011
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
06/14/2011
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 84, nays 9. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
06/09/2011
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011.
06/09/2011
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
06/08/2011
Reported favorably (16-0).
04/26/2011
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
04/25/2011
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.