06/03/2011 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
05/31/2011 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/26/2011 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/26/2011 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |||
05/26/2011 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |||
05/25/2011 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |||
05/09/2011 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |