|
06/27/2011
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/8/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/7/2011.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|