06/23/2011 | Returned to house of origin and approved on 6/23/2011. | |||
06/23/2011 | Approved on 6/23/11. | |||
06/20/2011 | Study request list distributed to the members on 6/20/11. | |||
06/20/2011 | Request study by the committee on Insurance. | |||
06/20/2011 | Received by the Senate Office on 6/20/11. | |||
06/20/2011 | Sent to the Senate. | |||
06/16/2011 | Study request list distributed to members on 6/16/2011. | |||
06/16/2011 | Received on 6/15/2011. |