06/23/2011 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/22/2011 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | |||
06/22/2011 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |||
05/23/2011 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/18/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/23/2011. | |||
05/12/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2011. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported favorably (17-0). | |||
05/09/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
05/05/2011 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |