06/22/2011 | Enrolled, signed by the Speaker of the House and taken by the Clerk of the House to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |||
06/21/2011 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | |||
06/20/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2011. | |||
06/19/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |||
06/16/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |||
06/15/2011 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011. | |||
06/14/2011 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
06/13/2011 | Reported favorably (10-0). | |||
06/01/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |||
05/31/2011 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |