LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR7
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR7
Action History
06/23/2011
Approved on 6/23/2011.
06/21/2011
Study request list distributed to members on 6/21/2011.
06/21/2011
Received on 6/20/2011.