06/02/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |||
06/01/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
05/31/2011 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 12 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
05/23/2011 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |||
05/17/2011 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |||
05/12/2011 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported with amendments. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |||
04/14/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |