|
06/20/2011
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported favorably (16-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|