|
06/29/2011
|
Effective date 6/29/11.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 334.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Arnold, Rosalind Jones, and White.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Walsworth, Martiny, and Claitor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with amendments (10-0-1) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|