LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB139
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB139
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2011 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB139
Action History
06/01/2011
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
05/31/2011
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
05/31/2011
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 16 nays.
05/24/2011
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
05/23/2011
Reported with amendments.
04/25/2011
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
04/14/2011
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.