|
06/29/2011
|
Effective date 8/15/11.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 336.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Foil, Dove, and Morris.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Chabert, and Smith, John.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
By a vote of 25 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/13/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|