|
07/13/2011
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Becomes Act No. 424
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
House conferees appointed: Tucker, Fannin, and Lambert.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Chaisson, Michot, and Jackson, L..
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended. Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported with amendments (21-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Finance.
|
|
|