|
06/21/2011
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Conference Committee appointments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 22. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported with amendments (10-6) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|