|
06/21/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|