|
06/24/2011
|
Effective date 6/24/11.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 123.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/17.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Reported favorably (10-0-1) (Local and Consent). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|