|
06/16/2011
|
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|