|
06/28/2011
|
Effective date 6/28/11.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 320.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Senate floor amendments were read and adopted.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 226. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|