|
06/20/2011
|
Indefinitely postponed by vote of yeas 48, nays 47.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2011
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 15 yeas and 13 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Substitute for Senate Bill No. 247. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|