06/14/2011 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
06/14/2011 | Rules suspended. | |||
06/14/2011 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |||
06/14/2011 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |||
06/13/2011 | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |||
06/09/2011 | Reported with amendments. | |||
05/24/2011 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. | |||
04/25/2011 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Education. | |||
04/13/2011 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Education. |